Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2750 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 4, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 27, 2021

Amended

Bill March 31, 2021
Bill February 22, 2021