House
|
05/10/2021
|
Approved by Governor 05/07/2021
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Stephens
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Rogers
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2021
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2021
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Finance
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 6
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Authored by Senator Paxton (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2021
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative Pfeiffer
|
|
|