Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2810 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 01/21/2021

                             
 
Req. No. 6820 	Page 1  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
STATE OF OKLAHOMA 
 
1st Session of the 58th Legislature (2021) 
 
HOUSE BILL 2810 	By: Sneed 
 
 
 
 
 
AS INTRODUCED 
 
An Act relating to public health; creating the Kidney 
Disease Prevention and Education Task Force Act; 
stating legislative findings; creat ing the Kidney 
Disease Prevention and Education Task Force; 
providing for membership; providing for meeting 
dates; providing that members serve without 
compensation; providing for staffing; requiring 
certain study, plan, and reports; providing a sunset 
date; providing for codification; and providing an 
effective date. 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     NEW LAW     A new section of law to be codified 
in the Oklahoma Statutes as Section 7315 of Titl e 63, unless there 
is created a duplication in numbering, reads as follows: 
This act shall be known and may be cited as the "Kidney Disease 
Prevention and Education Task Force Act ". 
SECTION 2.     NEW LAW     A new section of law to be codi fied 
in the Oklahoma Statutes as Section 7316 of Title 63, unless there 
is created a duplication in numbering, reads as follows: 
The Legislature finds that:   
 
Req. No. 6820 	Page 2  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
A.  Kidney disease is the ninth-leading cause of death in the 
United States.  An estimated thirty -seven million (37,000,000) 
people in the United States have chronic kidney disease and more 
than seventy-two thousand (72,000) people in the State of Oklahoma 
are living with the disease.  Early chronic kidney disease has no 
signs or symptoms and without ea rly detection can progress to kidney 
failure. 
B. If a person has high blood pressure, heart disease, 
diabetes, or a family history of kidney failure, the risk of kidney 
disease is greater. In Oklahoma, fourteen percent (14%) of all 
adults have diabetes, and nearly forty percent (40%) have high blood 
pressure.  The prevalence of diabetes, heart disease, and 
hypertension is higher for African Americans, who develop kidney 
failure at a rate of nearly four to one compared to Caucasians, 
while Hispanics have a thirty percent (30%) higher risk of 
developing kidney failure.  Almost twenty-nine percent (29%) of the 
people waiting for a kidney in the United States identify as African 
American, but, in 2019, less than twenty-six percent (26%) of those 
waiting received a kidney. 
C.  Although dialysis is a life -extending treatment, the best 
and most cost-effective treatment for kidney failure is a kidney 
transplant.  Currently, the wait in Oklahoma for a deceased donor 
kidney is five (5) to seven (7) years, and nationally twelve people 
die while waiting every day.   
 
Req. No. 6820 	Page 3  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
D.  If chronic kidney diseas e is detected early and managed 
appropriately, the individual can receive treatment sooner to help 
protect the kidneys, the deterioration in kidney function can be 
slowed or even stopped, and the risk of associated cardiovascular 
complications and other complications can be reduced. 
E.  In light of the Covid -19 pandemic and the increased risk of 
infection to patients with preexisting conditions and Covid-19 
patients acquiring acute k idney disease, it is imperative to provide 
support for those with kidney disease. 
SECTION 3.     NEW LAW     A new section of law to be codified 
in the Oklahoma Statutes as Section 7317 of Title 63, unless there 
is created a duplication in numbering, reads as follows: 
A.  There is hereby created the Kidney Disease Prevention and 
Education Task Force. 
B.  The Task Force shall consist of at least fourteen (14) 
members to be appointed or selected as follows: 
1.  The President Pro Tempore of the Oklahoma State Senate, or 
his or her designee, who shall serve as co chair; 
2.  The Speaker of the Oklahoma House of Representatives, or his 
or her designee, who shall serve as co chair; 
3.  One member of the Oklahoma State Senate, who shall be 
appointed by the minority leader of the Senate; 
4.  One member of the Oklahoma House of Representatives, who 
shall be appointed by the minority leader of the House;   
 
Req. No. 6820 	Page 4  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
5.  Two members, appointed by the G overnor, one of whom shall 
represent the State Department of Health and the other of whom shall 
represent a nationwide, nonprofit organization dedicated to kidney 
research, education, and support ; 
6.  The Secretary of State, or his or her designee; 
7.  Seven members appointed by the co chairs, as follows: 
a. one member representing the renal care provider 
community, 
b. one member representing a medical ce nter with a 
kidney-related program, 
c. one member representing the kidney physician 
community, 
d. one member representing a nonprofit organ procurement 
organization, 
e. one member representing the kidney patient community 
in Oklahoma, 
f. one member representing tribal governments, and 
g. one member representing providers of emergency 
ambulance transportation ; and 
8.  Other additional members, appointed by the cochairs as they 
see fit, representing public health clinics, community health 
centers, minority health organizations, and private health insurers. 
C.  The Task Force shall conduct an organizational meeting not 
later than December 31, 2021.  A majority of the members pres ent at   
 
Req. No. 6820 	Page 5  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
the organizational meeting or any subsequent meeting shall 
constitute a quorum for the purpose of any action taken including 
the preparation and approval of the report s required by subsection G 
of this section. The Task Force shall be authorized to meet as 
necessary in order to perform the duties imposed upon it. 
D.  Members of the Task Force shall serve without compensation . 
E.  Staff assistance for the Task Force shall be provided by the 
staff of the State Department of Health. 
F.  The Task Force shall conduct a study regarding chronic 
kidney disease, transplantations, living and deceased kidney 
donation, and the disparities in affliction rates among racial 
groups.  After the study is complete, the Task Force shall develop a 
sustainable plan to rai se awareness about early detection, promote 
health equity, promote transplantation, and reduce the burden of 
kidney disease throughout Oklahoma.  The plan shall include an 
ongoing campaign that includes health education workshops and 
seminars, preventive screenings, relevant research, and that 
promotes social media campaigns and television and radio 
commercials. 
G.  The Task Force shall submit an initial report to the 
Governor, the Speaker of the Oklahoma House of Representatives, and 
the President Pro Temp ore of the Oklahoma State Senate not later 
than December 31, 2022 , and annually thereafter .   
 
Req. No. 6820 	Page 6  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
H.  The provisions of this section shall cease to have the force 
and effect of law and the Task Force shall terminate effective 
January 1, 2027. 
SECTION 4.  This act shall become effective November 1, 2021. 
 
58-1-6820 AB 01/10/21