Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2870 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 10, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 21, 2021

Amended

Bill March 25, 2021
Bill February 4, 2021