House
|
05/24/2021
|
Approved by Governor 05/24/2021
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2021
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
JCR adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
Direct to Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 5
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2021
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2021
|
JCR; Do pass, amended by committee substitute Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2021
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2021
|
Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Hall
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Senator Thompson (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative Wallace, Hilbert
|
|
|