Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2961 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/20/2021

                            An Act 
ENROLLED HOUSE 
BILL NO. 2961 	By: Wallace of the House 
 
   and 
 
  Thompson of the Senate 
 
 
 
 
 
 
An Act relating to revenue and taxation; amending 68 
O.S. 2011, Section 2370, as amended by Section 1, 
Chapter 41, O.S.L. 2014 (68 O.S. Supp. 2020, Section 
2370), which relates to taxes in lieu of income tax 
for certain entities; modifying rate of tax; and 
providing an effective date. 
 
 
 
 
SUBJECT: Revenue and taxation 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
 
SECTION 1.     AMENDATORY     68 O.S. 2011, Section 2370, as 
amended by Section 1, Chapter 41, O.S.L. 2014 (68 O.S. Supp. 2020, 
Section 2370), is amended to read as follows: 
 
Section 2370.  A.  For taxable years beginning after December 
31, 1989 2021, for the privilege of doing business within this 
state, every state banking association, national banking association 
and credit union organized under the laws of this state, located or 
doing business within the limits of the State of Oklahoma shall 
annually pay to this state a priv ilege tax at the rate of six 
percent (6%) four percent (4%) of the amount of the taxable income 
as provided in this section. 
 
B.  1.  The privilege tax levied by this section shall be in 
addition to the Business Activity Tax levied in Section 1218 of this 
title and the franchise tax levied in Article 12 of this title and 
in lieu of the tax levied by Section 2355 of this title and in lieu 
of all taxes levied by the State of Oklahoma, or any subdivision 
thereof, upon the shares of stock or personal property o f any  ENR. H. B. NO. 2961 	Page 2 
banking association or credit union subject to taxation under this 
section. 
 
2.  Nothing in this section shall be construed to exempt the 
real property of any banking associations or credit unions from 
taxation to the same extent, according to its va lue, as other real 
property is taxed.  Nothing herein shall be construed to exempt an 
association from payment of any fee or tax authorized or levied 
pursuant to the banking laws. 
 
3.  Personal property which is subject to a lease agreement 
between a bank or credit union, as lessor, and a nonbanking business 
entity or individual, as lessee, is not exempt from personal 
property ad valorem taxation.  Provided further, that it shall be 
the duty of the lessee of such personal property to return sworn 
lists or schedules of their taxable property within each county to 
the county assessor of such county as provided in Sections 2433 and 
2434 of this title. 
 
C.  Any tax levied under this section shall accrue on the last 
day of the taxable year and be payable as provi ded in Section 2375 
of this title.  The accrual of such tax for the first taxable year 
to which this act applies, shall apply notwithstanding the prior 
accrual of a tax in the same taxable year based upon the net income 
of the next preceding taxable year; provided, however, any 
additional deduction enuring to the benefit of the taxpayer shall be 
deducted in accordance with the optional transitional deduction 
procedures in Section 2354 of this title. 
 
D.  The basis of the tax shall be United States taxable i ncome 
as defined in paragraph 10 of Section 2353 of this title and any 
adjustments thereto under the provisions of Section 2358 of this 
title with the following adjustments: 
 
1.  There shall be deducted all interest income on obligations 
of the United States government and agencies thereof not otherwise 
exempted and all interest income on obligations of the State of 
Oklahoma or political subdivisions thereof, including public trust 
authorities, not otherwise exempted under the laws of this state; 
and 
 
2.  Expense deductions claimed in arriving at taxable income 
under paragraph 10 of Section 2353 of this title shall be reduced by 
an amount equal to fifty percent (50%) of excluded interest income 
on obligations of the United States government or agencies there of  ENR. H. B. NO. 2961 	Page 3 
and obligations of the State of Oklahoma or political subdivisions 
thereof. 
 
E.  1.  Except as otherwise provided in paragraph 2 of this 
subsection, before January 1, 2017, there shall be allowed a credit 
against the tax levied in subsection A of this s ection in an amount 
equal to the amount of taxable income received by a participating 
financial institution as defined in Section 90.2 of Title 62 of the 
Oklahoma Statutes pursuant to a loan made under the Rural Economic 
Development Loan Act.  Such credit shall be limited each year to 
five percent (5%) of the amount of annual payroll certified by the 
Oklahoma Rural Economic Development Loan Program Review Board 
pursuant to the provisions of paragraph 3 of subsection B of Section 
90.4 of Title 62 of the Okla homa Statutes with respect to the loan 
made by the participating financial institution and may be claimed 
for any number of years necessary until the amount of total credits 
claimed is equal to the total amount of taxable income received by 
the participating financial institution pursuant to the loan.  Any 
credit allowed but not used in a taxable year may be carried forward 
for a period not to exceed five (5) taxable years.  In no event 
shall a credit allowed pursuant to the provisions of this subsection 
be transferable or refundable. 
 
2.  No credit otherwise authorized by the provisions of this 
subsection may be claimed for any event, transaction, investment, 
expenditure or other act occurring on or after July 1, 2010 , for 
which the credit would otherwise b e allowable.  The provisions of 
this paragraph shall cease to be operative on July 1, 2012.  
Beginning July 1, 2012, the credit authorized by this subsection may 
be claimed for any event, transaction, investment, expenditure or 
other act occurring on or af ter July 1, 2012, according to the 
provisions of this subsection. 
 
SECTION 2.  This act shall become effective January 1, 2022. 
  ENR. H. B. NO. 2961 	Page 4 
Passed the House of Representatives the 18th day of May, 2021. 
 
 
 
  
 	Presiding Officer of the House 
 	of Representatives 
 
 
Passed the Senate the 20th day of May, 2021. 
 
 
 
  
 	Presiding Officer of the Senate 
 
 
 
OFFICE OF THE GOVERNOR 
Received by the Office of the Governor this ____________________ 
day of ___________________, 20_______, at _______ o'clock _______ M. 
By: _________________________________ 
Approved by the Governor of the State of Oklahoma this _________ 
day of ___________________, 20_______, at _______ o'clock _______ M. 
 
 
 	_________________________________ 
 	Governor of the State of Oklahoma 
 
OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF STATE 
Received by the Office of the Secretary of State this __________ 
day of ___________________, 20_______, at _______ o'clock _______ M. 
By: _________________________________