Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2976 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 4, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 15, 2022

Enrolled

Bill April 27, 2022

Amended

Bill March 31, 2022
Bill March 7, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill March 2, 2022