Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2996 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 29, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 24, 2022

Enrolled

Bill April 26, 2022

Amended

Bill April 21, 2022
Bill March 7, 2022