Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB3003 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 01/05/2022

                             
 
Req. No. 9438 	Page 1  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
STATE OF OKLAHOMA 
 
2nd Session of the 58th Legislature (2022) 
 
HOUSE BILL 3003 	By: Bashore 
 
 
 
 
 
AS INTRODUCED 
 
An Act relating to alcoholic beverages; amending 37 A 
O.S. 2021, Section 1 -104, which relates to interim 
licenses; providing that a packa ge store may sale 
refrigerated alcoholic seltzer; and providing an 
effective date. 
 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     AMENDATORY     37 A O.S. 2021, Section 1 -104, is 
amended to read as follows : 
Section 1-104. A.  The Alcoholic Beverage Laws Enforcement 
Commission created in Section 1 of Article XXVIII of the Oklahoma 
Constitution is hereby re -created.  The purpose of the Commission 
shall be to enforce the alcoholic beverage laws of the state, and 
the Commission shall have such power and authority to enforce such 
laws, rules and regulations as shall be prescribed by the Oklahoma 
Alcoholic Beverage Control Act. 
B.  The Commission shall consist of seven (7) members, to be 
appointed by the Governor with the advice and consent of the State 
Senate; provided, members serving on Octo ber 1, 2017, shall continue   
 
Req. No. 9438 	Page 2  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
to serve until such time as their terms would have expired pursuant 
to the provisions of Section 1 of Article XXVIII of the Oklahoma 
Constitution.  Five of the members shall be at -large members 
representing the lay citizenry.  T he remaining two members shall be 
persons with law enforcement experience in this state.  Any time 
there is a vacancy on the Commission, the Governor shall appoint a 
replacement, with the advice and consent of the State Senate, within 
ninety (90) days. 
C.  Members of the Commission shall be appointed for a term of 
five (5) years. 
D.  No more than four members of the Commission shall be 
appointed from the same political party.  No more than two members 
of the Commission shall be appointed from the same feder al 
congressional district. 
E.  No member of the Commission shall hold any license 
authorized by the Oklahoma Alcoholic Beverage Control Act, or have 
any interest in any capa city, in the manufacture, sale, distribution 
or transportation of alcoholic beverag es. 
F.  The members of the Commission shall be removable from office 
for cause as other officers not subject to impeachment. 
G.  The Commission shall appoint a Director, who se duties shall 
be defined as provided in Section 1 -108 of this title. 
H.  The State of Oklahoma shall take all necessary steps to 
ensure the timely implementation of Enrolled Senate Joint Resolution   
 
Req. No. 9438 	Page 3  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
No. 68 of the 2nd Session of the 55th Oklahoma Legislatu re, if 
approved by the voters.  Consistent with this objective, the ABLE 
Commission shall have the power to issue interim licenses prior to 
October 1, 2018, as follows: 
1.  Except for the sale of wine or beer to the public, an 
interim license shall allow a ll qualified retail wine and retail 
beer licensees to perform all activities permis sible under a full 
license including but not limited to purchasing, stocking and 
storing the wine and/or full -strength beer prior to October 1, 2018.  
In order to qualify fo r an interim license, the licensee must 
satisfy all the requirements set forth in A rticle XXVIII-A of the 
Oklahoma Constitution and the Oklahoma Alcoholic Beverage Control 
Act.  This interim license shall convert to a full license on 
October 1, 2018; 
2.  Package stores may install refrigerated coolers for the 
storage of beer, alcoholic seltzer, and wine prior to October 1, 
2018, provided the refrigerated coolers shall not be used to cool 
product below room temperature prior to October 1, 2018; and 
3.  An interim license shall allow all qualified wine and 
spirits wholesalers and beer distr ibutors to perform all activities 
permissible under a full license including but not limited to 
selling and delivering wine and/or full -strength beer to all 
qualified retail wine and retail beer licensees.  A wine and spirits 
wholesaler that has been desig nated by a manufacturer as a   
 
Req. No. 9438 	Page 4  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
distributor of its wine or spirits may post those designated 
products by line-item, consistent with Section 3 -116.2 of this 
title, on September 15, 2018, for sale effective October 1, 2018.  
In order to qualify for an interim l icense, the wine and spirits 
wholesaler and beer distributor must comply with the provisions set 
forth in Article XXVIII -A of the Oklahoma Constitution and the 
Oklahoma Alcoholic Beverage Control Act.  The interim license shall 
convert to a full license on October 1, 2018. 
Provided, however, that a brewer is only permitted to sell beer 
or cider to a beer distributor holding a valid interim license 
pursuant to this section as follows: 
a. such sales may begin no sooner than September 1, 2018, 
b. the beer distributor either must be assigned a beer 
distributor territory by the brewer pursuant to a 
distributor agreement to begin October 1, 2018, or be 
a brewer or an affiliate of a brewer that will be 
permitted to distribute beer within two territories 
pursuant to the provisions of subsection E of Section 
3-108 of this title, and 
c. the interim license only permits sales to retailers by 
the interim licensee either in the distribution 
territory as set forth in the distributor agreement or 
in the two territories perm itted pursuant to the   
 
Req. No. 9438 	Page 5  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
provisions of subsection E of Section 3 -108 of this 
title. 
I.  No retail wine or retail beer licensee may sell wine and/or 
beer, other than low -point beer, and no package store may sell 
refrigerated wine and/or beer, prior to October 1, 2018.  The sale 
or refrigeration of wine and/or beer in violation of this subsection 
shall result in the revocation of the interim license and a monetary 
fine of Twenty-five Thousand Dollars ($25,000.00). 
SECTION 2.  This act shall becom e effective November 1, 2022. 
 
58-2-9438 JL 12/30/21