Senate | 04/11/2022 | Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/24/2022 | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/09/2022 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/08/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/08/2022 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/08/2022 | Authored by Senator Rogers (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/08/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 03/02/2022 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute County and Municipal Government Committee | ||
House | 02/10/2022 | Referred to County and Municipal Government | ||
House | 02/10/2022 | Withdrawn from Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Representative Sims |