Senate | 04/06/2022 | Coauthored by Representative McDugle | ||
Senate | 03/24/2022 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/09/2022 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/08/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/08/2022 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 1 | ||
House | 03/08/2022 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Phillips | ||
House | 03/08/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 03/02/2022 | Authored by Senator Jett (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/02/2022 | CR; Do Pass Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Health Services and Long-Term Care | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Representative Fetgatter |