Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB3021 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 14, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 10, 2022

Enrolled

Bill April 26, 2022

Amended

Bill March 30, 2022
Bill March 2, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill March 1, 2022