House
|
05/11/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/11/2022
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2022
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2022
|
Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Pederson
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2022
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2022
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Patzkowsky
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2022
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2022
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Energy committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator David
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Energy Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Paxton
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Davis
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Conley, Roe, CrosswhiteHader, Lowe (Dick)
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Authored by Senator Allen (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Transportation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Transportation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Representative Boles
|
|
|