House
|
05/02/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/02/2022
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2022
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
Amended by floor substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Fugate
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
Authored by Senator Garvin (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Public Health
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Representative Boles
|
|
|