Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB3075 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2022

Engrossed

Bill April 27, 2022
Bill February 22, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 10, 2022

Amended

Bill April 6, 2022
Bill February 10, 2022