Senate | 04/06/2022 | Coauthored by Representative Caldwell (Chad) | ||
Senate | 03/24/2022 | Second Reading referred to Education | ||
House | 03/08/2022 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/08/2022 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/07/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/07/2022 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 5 | ||
House | 03/07/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 03/01/2022 | Authored by Senator Pugh (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/01/2022 | CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Common Education | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Representative Hilbert |