House
|
05/05/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/05/2022
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Amendment restored bill to engrossed version
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Backed up to General Order
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Motion to reconsider vote adopted: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Stephens
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Standridge
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Burns
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appr/Sub-Natural Resources and Regulatory Services sub-committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2022
|
Referred to Appr/Sub-Natural Resources and Regulatory Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Authored by Senator Quinn (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Representative Lepak
|
|
|