House
|
04/28/2022
|
Approved by Governor 04/28/2022
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2022
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Reported Do Pass Finance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative McDugle
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Finance
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 3
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Authored by Senator Bergstrom (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
CR; Do Pass General Government Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to General Government
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Representative Kendrix
|
|
|