Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB3179 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 28, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 2, 2022

Amended

Bill April 11, 2022
Bill March 2, 2022