Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB3243 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 14, 2022

Enrolled

Bill April 20, 2022

Amended

Bill March 31, 2022
Bill March 4, 2022