House
|
05/05/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/05/2022
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Jett
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Brooks
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Pederson
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Merrick
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Townley
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2022
|
Reported Do Pass Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Authored by Senator Stephens (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture and Rural Development Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Representative Randleman
|
|
|