Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB3271 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 10, 2022

Enrolled

Bill April 27, 2022

Amended

Bill April 4, 2022
Bill February 21, 2022