Senate | 03/29/2022 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 03/28/2022 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/28/2022 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/24/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/24/2022 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 51 Nays: 40 | ||
House | 03/24/2022 | Title stricken | ||
House | 03/24/2022 | Amended | ||
House | 03/24/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 02/09/2022 | Authored by Senator Bullard (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/09/2022 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Olsen | ||
House | 02/09/2022 | CR; Do Pass State Powers Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to State Powers | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Representative Humphrey |