Senate | 04/06/2022 | Coauthored by Representative Blancett | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 03/28/2022 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/28/2022 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/24/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/24/2022 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/24/2022 | Title stricken | ||
House | 03/24/2022 | Amended | ||
House | 03/24/2022 | House Rule suspended | ||
House | 03/24/2022 | Authored by Senator Taylor (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/24/2022 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Fugate | ||
House | 03/24/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | CR; Do Pass Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee | ||
House | 03/02/2022 | Referred to Criminal Justice and Corrections | ||
House | 03/02/2022 | Withdrawn from Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Representative Humphrey |