House
|
05/02/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/02/2022
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Amendment restored bill to engrossed version
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 4
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Third Reading rescinded
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Rader
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Fugate, Stark, Waldron, Goodwin, Lepak
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Authored by Senator Pugh (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Talley, Echols
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Criminal Justice and Corrections
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Representative Miller
|
|
|