House
|
05/20/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/20/2022
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2022
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2022
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2022
|
Motion expired
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Miller
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 60 Nays: 23; Ayes: 58 Nays: 20
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2022
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Rules committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 14
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Adoption of the floor substitute rescinded
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Amended by floor substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Roe
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
Authored by Senator Stanley (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Elections and Ethics Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Elections and Ethics
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Representative Miller
|
|
|