Senate | 04/13/2022 | Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Enacting clause stricken | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 9 | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | Title stricken | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | Authored by Senator Rogers (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 02/10/2022 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Representative Fetgatter |