Senate | 04/13/2022 | Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 04/12/2022 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/12/2022 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 04/12/2022 | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/24/2022 | Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/10/2022 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 71 Nays: 24 | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | Authored by Senator Pugh (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | Remove as coauthor Representative(s) Fugate | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | Coauthored by Representative(s) CrosswhiteHader | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Fugate | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Representative McCall, McBride |