Senate | 04/13/2022 | Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 04/12/2022 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/12/2022 | Enacting clause stricken | ||
Senate | 04/12/2022 | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 03/28/2022 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/28/2022 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | Title stricken | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | Amended | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | Authored by Senator Allen (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Wallace, Sims, McDugle | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | Emergency added | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Phillips | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Representative McCall |