House
|
05/05/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/05/2022
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
Authored by Senator Pederson (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Representative McCall
|
|
|