House
|
05/09/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/06/2022
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Amendment restored bill to engrossed version
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Authored by Senator Treat (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Boles, Phillips
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Representative McCall
|
|
|