Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative McEntire
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 2
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
Amended by floor substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Goodwin, Munson, Bashore
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Authored by Senator Simpson (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Talley, Lawson
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Representative West (Tammy)
|
|
|