Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
Conference granted, SCs named Howard, Allen, Taylor, Rader, Standridge, Quinn, Hicks
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Energy and Natural Resources
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
remove as principal author Representative Moore and substitute with Representative Hilbert
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Energy committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Energy
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
Authored by Senator Howard (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy and Natural Resources Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Referred to Energy and Natural Resources
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Representative Moore
|
|
|