Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Pae
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
remove as principal author Representative Pae and substitute with Representative Phillips
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
remove as coauthor Representative(s) Phillips
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 62 Nays: 30; Ayes: 66 Nays: 25
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Amended by floor substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
House Rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Manger, Walke, Brewer, Munson
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
Authored by Senator Paxton (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Phillips, Rosecrants, McEntire, Martinez, Dempsey, Dollens, Humphrey, Echols, Talley, McDugle, Davis
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Public Health
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Representative Pae
|
|
|