Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB3415 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2022

Engrossed

Bill April 28, 2022
Bill March 23, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill May 18, 2022
Bill February 17, 2022

Amended

Bill April 13, 2022
Bill February 21, 2022