Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB3420 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2022

Engrossed

Bill April 27, 2022
Bill March 24, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 10, 2022

Amended

Bill April 13, 2022
Bill March 4, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill March 2, 2022