House
|
05/16/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/16/2022
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2022
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2022
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 4
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
Placed on General Order
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
Withdrawn from Appropriations committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 12
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
Authored by Senator Kidd (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture and Rural Development Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Referred to Agriculture and Rural Development
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Representative Kerbs
|
|
|