Senate | 03/24/2022 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | ||
House | 03/14/2022 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/14/2022 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Lepak | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | Authored by Senator Daniels (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Fugate | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Representative ODonnell |