Senate | 03/29/2022 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/15/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/15/2022 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 51 Nays: 36 | ||
House | 03/15/2022 | Motion to reconsider adopted: Ayes: 57 Nays: 16 | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative ODonnell | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 50 Nays: 33 | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | Authored by Senator Daniels (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Representative ODonnell |