House
|
05/16/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/16/2022
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2022
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2022
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
Amended by floor substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
Authored by Senator Montgomery (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Phillips
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
CR; Do Pass Insurance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Insurance
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Representative McEntire
|
|
|