House
|
05/03/2022
|
Vetoed 05/03/2022
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Amendment restored bill to engrossed version
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2022
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Authored by Senator Pugh (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Health Services and Long-Term Care
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Representative Caldwell (Chad)
|
|
|