House
|
05/26/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/25/2022
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2022
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 6
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 9
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 9
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
Amended by floor substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
House Rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Authored by Senator Thompson (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Representative McBride
|
|
|