Senate | 04/11/2022 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Reported Do Pass as amended Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance | ||
House | 03/28/2022 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/28/2022 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | Authored by Senator Garvin (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | Coauthored by Representative(s) McDugle, Roe, Fugate | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/28/2022 | Remove Representative McEntire as principal House author and substitute with Representative Echols | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Representative McEntire |