Senate | 03/29/2022 | Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 03/28/2022 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/28/2022 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 19 | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 03/02/2022 | Authored by Senator Montgomery (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/02/2022 | Title stricken | ||
House | 03/02/2022 | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Representative Lepak |