Senate | 04/13/2022 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 04/12/2022 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Emergency added | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/24/2022 | Second Reading referred to Energy | ||
House | 03/08/2022 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/08/2022 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/07/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/07/2022 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 3 | ||
House | 03/07/2022 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Humphrey | ||
House | 03/07/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 02/17/2022 | Authored by Senator Bullard (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/17/2022 | CR; Do Pass Energy and Natural Resources Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Energy and Natural Resources | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Representative Dempsey |