Senate | 04/06/2022 | Coauthored by Representative McDugle | ||
Senate | 03/24/2022 | Second Reading referred to Finance | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/09/2022 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/08/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/08/2022 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 12 | ||
House | 03/08/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 03/02/2022 | Coauthored by Senator(s) Kidd | ||
House | 03/02/2022 | Authored by Senator Coleman (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/02/2022 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Humphrey | ||
House | 03/02/2022 | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 02/22/2022 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Representative Dempsey |