Senate | 03/30/2022 | Failed in Committee - Rules | ||
Senate | 03/24/2022 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/09/2022 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/08/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/08/2022 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 72 Nays: 19 | ||
House | 03/08/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 03/02/2022 | Authored by Senator Coleman (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/02/2022 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute County and Municipal Government Committee | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | Remove Representative Dempsey as principal House author and substitute with Representative Pae | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to County and Municipal Government | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Representative Dempsey |