House
|
05/02/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/02/2022
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 9
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Davis
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Boles
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Authored by Senator Leewright (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Moore
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
CR; Do Pass Tourism Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Tourism
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Representative Dills
|
|
|