Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB3650 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 01/20/2022

                            RBH No. 8661 
Req. No. 8661 	Page 1  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
STATE OF OKLAHOMA 
 
2nd Session of the 58th Legislature (2022) 
 
HOUSE BILL 3650 	By: Dills 
 
 
 
 
 
AS INTRODUCED 
 
An Act relating to the Teachers' Retirement System of 
Oklahoma; amending 70 O.S. 2021, Section 17 -103, 
which relates to membership; modify ing provisions 
related to option for participation in Teachers' 
Retirement System or the Oklahoma Public Employees 
Retirement System; providing an effectiv e date; and 
declaring an emergency . 
 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA : 
SECTION 1.     AMENDATORY     70 O.S. 2021, Section 17 -103, is 
amended to read as follows: 
Section 17-103. Except as provided in the Alternat e Retirement 
Plan for Comprehensive Universities Act, the membership of the 
retirement system shall consist of the following: 
A. All classified personnel shall become members of the 
retirement system as a condition of their employment; 
B.  For the period from August 2, 1969, to the effective date of 
this act, all full-time nonclassified optional personnel regularly 
employed for more than one (1) year may join the Teachers' 
Retirement System of Oklahoma subject to the rules and regulations  RBH No. 8661 
Req. No. 8661 	Page 2  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
adopted pursuant to the Teachers' Retirement System.  On or after 
the effective date of this act, all nonclassified optional personnel 
regularly employed for twenty (20) hours or more per week may join 
the System upon hiring, subject to the provisions of subsection C of 
this section and the rules and regulations adopted by the System 
pursuant to this act. 
C.  1.  A nonclassified optional employee shall have thirty (30) 
days from the initial date of hire t o make a one-time irrevocable 
written election to opt out of participation in the System.  If an 
eligible employee fails to make an election within the thirty-day 
period, the eligible employee shall be deemed to participate in the 
System. 
2.  If an eligible employee elects to opt out of particip ation 
in the System, the employee shall not make any required employee 
contributions to the System and his or her employer shall not make 
any required employer contributions to the System . 
3.  If an eligible nonclassified optional employee elects to 
participate in the System, the employee shall make employee 
contributions to the System pursuant to Section 17-116.2 of this 
title and the employer shall make employer contributions to the 
System pursuant to Secti on 17-108.1 of this title.  Nothing in this 
paragraph shall be construed to prohibit the employer from making 
the contribution of the employee to the System on behalf of the 
employee.  RBH No. 8661 
Req. No. 8661 	Page 3  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
4.  A nonclassified optional employee who op ts out of 
participation in the System shall be ineligible for future 
participation in the System; provided, however, that if the employee 
is hired for a classified position, he or she shall become a member 
of the System pursuant to subsection A of this section but shall not 
be eligible for prior service credit for service performed while 
employed in a nonclassified position during which the employee opte d 
out of participation in the System. 
5.  Any nonclassified optional employee employed on the 
effective date of this act shall make an irr evocable written 
election to participate in or opt out of the System pursuant to 
paragraph 1 of this subsection.  If the employee fails to make an 
election within thirty (30) days from the effective date of this 
act, the employee shall be deemed to partici pate in the System, 
subject to the provisions of paragraph 3 of this subsection. 
D.  The Board of Trustees may, in its discretion, deny the right 
to become members to any class of members whose compensation is only 
partly paid by the state, or who is serv ing on a temporary or other 
than per annum basis, and it also may, in its discretion, make 
optional with members in any such class their individual entrance 
into the retirement system. 
E. Should any member, with less than ten (10) years of teaching 
service in Oklahoma, in any period of six (6) consecutive years 
after becoming a member be absent from service more than five (5)  RBH No. 8661 
Req. No. 8661 	Page 4  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
years, withdraw his or her contributions, retire or die, he or she 
shall thereupon cease to be a member.  The provisions of this 
paragraph subsection shall not apply to any member of the Teachers' 
Retirement System who has been a member of such classes of military 
services as may be approved by the Board of Trustees, until a period 
of one and one-half (1 1/2) years from date of termination of su ch 
service shall have elapsed. 
F. Effective November 1, 2019, a A retired member of the 
Teachers' Retirement System who becomes employed by the State 
Department of Education for the first time on or after November 1, 
2019, shall have the option to remain a member of the Teachers' 
Retirement System subject to any applicable limitations placed on 
retired members returning to work or may choose to participate in 
the Oklahoma Public Employees Retirement System as an active member. 
SECTION 2.  This act shall become effective July 1, 2022. 
SECTION 3.  It being immediately necessary for the preservation 
of the public peace, health or safety, an emergency is hereby 
declared to exist, by reason whereof thi s act shall take effect and 
be in full force from and after its passage and approval. 
 
58-2-8661 MAH 12/30/21  
 
THOMAS E. CUMMINS  CONSULTING ACTUARY, INC. 
2512 E. 71
st  
Street ,  Suite D ∙  Tulsa, Oklahoma 74136                             (918) 492-9658  ∙ (918) 492- 9659 
 
 
 
 
January 13, 2022 
 
 
 
Representative Dills 
Room 260.2 
 
 
Re: RBH No. 8661 
 
 
RBH No. 8661 is a shell bill. 
 
This bill is a non fiscal bill under OPLAA A.  
 
I am a member of the American Academy of Actuaries and meet the 
Qualification Standards of the American Academy of Actuaries to 
render the actuarial opinion herein. 
 
 
Thomas E. Cummins 
 
Thomas E. Cummins, MAAA