Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB3674 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 28, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 2, 2022

Amended

Bill April 13, 2022
Bill March 4, 2022